WebJun 6, 2024 · Mrs Cha was elected as Chairman of the HKEX by the directors at the board meeting on April 27, 2024. Section 69 (1) of the SFO provides that no person shall be the … WebSep 13, 2024 · 13 Sep 2024. Hong Kong Exchanges and Clearing Limited (HKEX) is today (Monday) pleased to announce the appointment of Mr Anthony Crampton as Managing …
Retirement of Charles Li as Chief Executive and …
WebFeb 10, 2024 · February 10, 2024 8:35 am Hong Kong Exchanges and Clearing Limited (HKEX) has announced the appointment of Alejandro Nicolas Aguzin as Chief Executive of HKEX. The appointment will take effect on 24 May 2024 for a term of three years, subject to the approval of the Securities and Futures Commission. WebJun 21, 2024 · HKEX corporate revenue has increased by nine-fold between 2000 and 2024. HKEX Chairman Laura M Cha (fourth from left) and HKEX Chief Executive Officer Nicolas Aguzin (fourth from right) hosted a ceremony celebrating HKEX’s 22nd anniversary as a listed company. dr. michael cerveris
Teh Wing Kwan - Chairman - China Vanadium Titano-Magnetite …
WebFeb 9, 2024 · He will replace Charles Li, another former JPMorgan banker, who announced his resignation as CEO of Hong Kong Exchanges and Clearing (HKEX) in May. Aguzin, whose appointment is subject to approval ... WebHKEX is the world’s leading IPO market and as Hong Kong’s only securities and derivatives exchange and sole operator of its clearing houses, it is uniquely placed to offer regional and international investors access to Asia’s most vibrant market. Investor Relations Financial … Management - Laura May-Lung CHA - HKEX Group HKEX believes in maintaining open, transparent, and constructive dialogue … Dividend - Laura May-Lung CHA - HKEX Group Hkex Biotech Summit - Laura May-Lung CHA - HKEX Group Contact - Laura May-Lung CHA - HKEX Group Financial Calendar - Laura May-Lung CHA - HKEX Group LME Asia Metals Seminar - Laura May-Lung CHA - HKEX Group Media Centre - Laura May-Lung CHA - HKEX Group Principal Subsidiaries - Laura May-Lung CHA - HKEX Group CSR Reports - Laura May-Lung CHA - HKEX Group WebApr 11, 2024 · Investor Enquiries: Mark Lee, Senior Vice President +852 2121 8200 Annie Cheng, Vice President +1 (973) 306 4490 Media Enquiries dr michael cecil lexington clinic